CAFE MILK CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cafe Milk CIO is a charity to support infant feeding in the East Surrey area. We run free, cafe style breastfeeding support drop-ins attended by healthcare professionals, qualified breastfeeding counsellors and peer supporters. Currently we have weekly Cafe Milk sessions in Caterham, Redhill and Horley during term time. We also regularly train breastfeeding mothers to become peer supporters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £9,446 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 January 2023: CIO registration
- FEEDING SUPPORT IN EAST SURREY CIC (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dionne Grogan | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cherrelle Ann Mclean | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Romy Secker | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Louise Shields | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Ashfield | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN THE TECHNIQUES AND HEALTH BENEFITS OF BREASTFEEDING BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO FAMILIES IN THE SURREY AREA. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO VOLUNTEERS IN THE SURREY AREA SO THAT THEY CAN EXPAND THEIR SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE IN SUPPORTING SUCCESSFUL BREASTFEEDING TO BUILD EXPERTISE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 SOMERSET ROAD
REDHILL
RH1 6LT
- Phone:
- 07989398462
- Email:
- cafemilkcio@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window