Hartlepool Sea Cadets

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cadets can gain skills that assist employers, for example self-confidence, leadership and good communication skills. Further skills learnt by the youngsters include life saving, Seamanship, Canoeing, Navigation, Communications, Sailing, Cookery, Rowing, Swimming, Wind Surfing. The unit also has a very successful band which performs at many local events throughout the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 14 January 1964: Standard registration
- T.S TRINCOMALEE (Working name)
- HARTLEPOOL UNIT NO 172 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- HARTLEPOOLS UNIT NO 172, SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terrance Iles | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Viles | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fox | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pam Taylor | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HARRISON | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.21k | £32.46k | £9.26k | £16.36k | £7.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.77k | £7.44k | £8.81k | £15.37k | £10.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS as amended on 14 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOLS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hartlepool Sea Cadets
Middleton House
Harbour Walk
HARTLEPOOL
TS24 0YQ
- Phone:
- 01429272284
- Email:
- info@hartlepoolscc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window