CANBERRA HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Canberra Heritage Trust is an educational and research facility to record, preserve and educate on the role of the Canberra in Royal Air Force (RAF) service from 1951 to 2006. The Trust will also document and make available records relating to non-RAF Canberra operations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Delve | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Warren | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHEEHAN | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 November 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE CANBERRA (ENGLISH ELECTRIC ALL VARIANTS) AS A COLD WAR HERITAGE AIRCRAFT IN SERVICE WITH THE ROYAL AIR FORCE 1951 – 2006 AND ALSO IN NON RAF OPERATIONS BY: A) MAINTAINING AND OPERATING A PUBLIC HERITAGE CENTRE AND COLLECTION AND OFFERING PUBLIC ACCESS THROUGH REGULAR OPEN DAYS AND EVENTS; B) PROMOTING RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; C) LENDING TO MUSEUMS AND RESEARCH LOCATIONS AND PROVIDING MATERIAL TO EDUCATIONAL DISPLAYS; D) OPERATING A WEBSITE AND PUBLISHING ON-LINE AND HARD COPY RESOURCES AND ARTICLES ABOUT THE HERITAGE AIRCRAFT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Watton Road
SWAFFHAM
PE37 8HF
- Phone:
- 01760725040
- Email:
- info@canberraheritage.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window