PRO LEVEL VISION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide academy style football coaching for vulnerable children in Stoke on Trent, Staffordshire and Cheshire. Vulnerable includes children from low-income households, children who have experienced abuse or neglect or are in care or who are young carers, and children who who have special educational needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 19 April 2023: CIO registration
- PRO LEVEL ACADEMY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Conlon | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hiles | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Smith | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cherry | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Smith | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cherry | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Ridgway | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN STOKE ON TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE AND CHESHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ‘VULNERABLE’ INCLUDES CHILDREN FROM LOW INCOME HOUSEHOLDS, CHILDREN WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED ABUSE OR NEGLECT OR ARE IN CARE OR WHO ARE YOUNG CARERS, AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OR DISABILITIES
Area of benefit
STOKE ON TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE AND CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kyzen Sports
25 GOODLASS ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L24 9HJ
- Phone:
- 07518431839
- Email:
- prolevelacademy@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window