ROTARY IN GUILDFORD CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money through local fundraising activities, consistent with the aims of Rotary international, and provide human resources, to assist the poor and needy and to support local educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 2022: CIO registration
- 14 July 2023: Funds received from 261639 THE ROTARY CLUB OF GUILDFORD BENEVOLENT FUND
- RING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL JACKSON | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter James O'Keefe | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholas Bowen-Ashwin | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Saith Ramcharan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Donald Stewart Raffin | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Day | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grant Stuart Connell | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin John Freeman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | £26.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £20.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY IN GUILDFORD, ANY OTHER PART OF THE UK OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE MEMBERS OF THE CIO SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING DIRECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Ashcroft
Shalford
Guildford
- Phone:
- 01483563242
- Email:
- andrewjnotary@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
RotaryinGuildford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window