WISH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 November 2023
Total income includes £2,600 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 22 February 2023: CIO registration
- ACTION AID FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasima Islam | Chair | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farhana Sharmin Riju | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanjidah Afsa | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 November 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 November 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 JOLLES HOUSE
90 BROMLEY HIGH STREET
LONDON
E3 3YF
- Phone:
- 07507952171
- Email:
- nasimaislam71@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window