CG PHILANTHROPIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, Poverty, Sustainable Development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
niall david joseph carroll Mr | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LAWRENCE KINGSTON | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
CLIFFORD JAMES SACKS | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL SKILLS OF PEOPLE; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. EACH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND BY SUPPORTING INITIATIVES AND INSTITUTIONS AND THE MAKING GRANTS IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES. IN THESE OBJECTS, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SOUTH END
LONDON
W8 5BU
- Phone:
- 07807227834
- Email:
- niall.carroll@cg-tech.co
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window