BYOMA KUSUMA BUDDHADHARMA SANGHA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Byoma Kusuma Buddhadharma Sangha is set up to achieve the goal of making all aspects of the Mahayana/Vajrayana School of Buddhism easily accessible to anyone and everyone who is interested in learning and practicing them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nibal Sulaiman | Chair | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ayashna Dhakal | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shyam Maharjan | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF BUDDHIST FAITH, IN PARTICULAR, TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA UNDER THE SPIRITUAL AUTHORITY AND GUIDANCE OF THE VIDYADHARA ACARYA MAHAYOGI SRIDHAR RANA RINPOCHE AND MAKE IT ACCESSIBLE TO ALL. ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS WILL INCLUDE PROMOTING ACTIVITIES THAT SUPPORT THE PRACTICE OF CULTIVATING LOVING KINDNESS, COMPASSION AND WISDOM ACCORDING TO THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Canfield Drive
Ruislip
HA4 6QW
- Phone:
- 02088451251
- Email:
- bk-uk@byomakusuma.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window