HARRIS MUSIC CLUB

Charity Number: 1200986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the public education and appreciation of classical music by promoting a concert series open to the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £9,426
Total expenditure: £7,132

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HARRIS MUSIC PRESTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THOMAS COSTICH Chair 11 May 2022
None on record
Carol Kershaw Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Rosemary Gillian Pell Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Dorothy Wade Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Kathleen Atkins Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
James Walton Trustee 10 April 2023
None on record
Col. Alan Jolley Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Prof. Alastair Thomas Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.87k £9.43k
Total expenditure £7.54k £7.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
255 BLACK BULL LANE
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 9YD
Phone:
01772719433
Website:

harrismusicpreston.uk