Trustees CLEHONGER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Smellie Chair 25 February 2025
None on record
Elaine Mary Horton Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
George Nicholas Rider Trustee 26 August 2024
HEREFORD LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Krina Bernice Langdon Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Joanne Bryant Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Josephine Gardiner Trustee 29 April 2022
None on record
Joyce Rider Trustee
None on record