THE HYKEHAM SAILING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND WINDSURFING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 June 2023: CIO registration
- HYKEHAM SAILING CLUB (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan James Donald | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna McShane | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Allan Adair | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Alan Woodthorpe | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ZOE ASHLEY | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeffrey Upton | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Peters | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 December 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 December 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND WINDSURFING. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING THOSE NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND WINDSURFING FOR SCHOOLS IN LINCOLNSHIRE. C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABLEMENT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HYKEHAM SAILING CLUB
APEX PITS
NEWARK ROAD
NORTH HYKEHAM
LINCOLN
LN6 9SP
- Phone:
- 01522684287
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window