STEPPS

Charity number: 1203319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

STEPPS provides mental health first aid training and educational workshops for dance schools, companies, and performing artists. Our services, delivered by therapists with a dance background, include low cost counselling, resources, and tailored programmes to enhance mental well-being, reduce stigma, and promote resilience within the UK's performing arts community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024

Total income: £1,496
Total expenditure: £417

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DENISE FIENNES Chair
THE FRIENDS OF THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS
Received: On time
COLCHESTER MUSEUMS DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Marta Zielonka Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Joseph Isaac Powell-Main Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Matz Skoog Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Hugh James Ellis-Rees Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Ann Wall Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Stuart Waters Trustee 10 October 2022
CANDOCO DANCE COMPANY
Received: On time
Taira Foo Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
ASH MUKHERJEE Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Timothy Branson Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2024
Total gross income £1.50k
Total expenditure £417
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 09 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BANK COTTAGE
DODNOR LANE
NEWPORT
PO30 5TD
Phone:
07831567530