Trustees MEMORIAL HALL (DULAS) (EWYAS HAROLD-KENDERCHURCH-KENTCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL)

Charity number: 520947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Malcolm Bradley Chair 01 May 2010
None on record
Sue M Jones Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Andrew Lee-Jones Trustee 29 January 2019
None on record
Glyn Baker Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
John Trefor Edwards Trustee 01 May 2017
DORE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Received: On time
Mrs J Barns-Graham Trustee 01 May 2015
None on record
Ann Bradley Trustee 01 May 2009
None on record