Trustees EATON BISHOP VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 520948

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Coleman | Chair | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Lambeth | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Cain | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kimber | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
eileen Sims | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Davies | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phil Davies | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Moe Netting | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clive Harper | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICK NETTING | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DARTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.