NEWCASTLE DOG AND CAT SHELTER

Charity Number: 1201840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the charity are for the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREA WYLIE Chair 06 February 2023
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DOG AND CAT SHELTER AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Received: On time
Sir Graham Wylie Foundation
Received: On time
Anthony Michael Hodson Trustee 19 March 2024
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
Ashleigh Louise Wright Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Thomas William McCarthy Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Nick Manson Trustee 06 February 2023
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DOG AND CAT SHELTER AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Received: On time
JENNIFER MARY SIMPSON Trustee 06 February 2023
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DOG AND CAT SHELTER AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2024
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEWCASTLE DOG & CAT SHELTER
BENTON NORTH FARM
BENTON LANE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE12 8EH
Phone:
01912150435