WINDMILL TORBAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Situated in Torquay, Windmill Torbay offers a wide range of services aimed at improving the well-being and social integration of Torbay residents. Activities include youth clubs, adult wellbeing and support, health and welfare initiatives and benefits advice services. We provide a safe space for people to connect, learn, and access resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 17 February 2023: CIO registration
- THE WINDMILL CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Harman | Chair | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Paton | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Giles | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN OR MANAGE, OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF, SUCH A CENTRE, FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (2) THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY OR DISABLED PEOPLE AND THOSE IN POOR HEALTH IN TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED OF SOCIAL CARE AND/OR THOSE WITH LONG TERM HEALTH CONDITIONS; (3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS IN TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ANY MEANS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN FINANCIAL MATTERS AND MANAGING AND DELIVERING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; (4) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WINDMILL CENTRE
PENDENNIS ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ2 7QR
- Phone:
- 01803314876
- Email:
- info@thewindmillcentre.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window