OPENDOORS 4U

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need, by reason of disability, including those with learning disabilities and their families and carers, for the public benefit in the United Kingdom, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of services, support, recreational facilities, access to the arts, advice and social events. The Charity helps: children/young people, people with learning needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Simms | Chair | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Rutheva Watkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Philip McCormick | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lloyd Gordon MCIAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF DISABILITY, INCLUDING THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, SUPPORT, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, ACCESS TO THE ARTS, ADVICE AND SOCIAL EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Number 1 Business Centre
1 Alvin Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 3EJ
- Phone:
- 07985105198
- Email:
- Diversecity2005@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window