NOT QUITE WIRED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to promote humane behaviour towards Wire Haired Fox Terriers in the UK. by providing appropriate care & protection for WFTs which are in need of such care - re-homing such dogs where possible. We can also provide financial assistance to support the care and treatment of dogs for resident in the UK who are unable to meet the costs of such care and treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Thomas Delany | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry James Stamp | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Taylor | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £897 | |
|
Total expenditure | £503 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
“FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS (PARTICULARLY WIRE-HAIRED FOX TERRIERS) IN THE UK BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WIRE HAIRED FOX TERRIERS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, RE-HOMING SUCH DOGS WHERE POSSIBLE. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUPPORT THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF DOGS BELONGING TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UK WHO ARE UNABLE TO MEET THE COSTS OF SUCH CARE AND TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 AUDMORE ROAD
GNOSALL
STAFFORD
ST20 0HD
- Phone:
- 07970180157
- Email:
- stephen@notquitewired.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window