DHCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Organisation for community activities in and around the North of Newcastle upon Tyne
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
Governance
- 16 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hasan Hamid | Chair | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ahmeduddin Imran Mohammed | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Taha Benjaber | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Dessoky | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kashif Ahmad | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN DARRAS HALL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SERVICES FOR RELIGIOUS PRAYER AND WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL EVENTS AND OUTREACH WORK IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY INCLUDING ACTIVITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o MOTOHART
10 Samson Close
Killingworth
Newcastle
NE12 6DX
- Phone:
- 01916030020
- Email:
- dhcc@motohart.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window