PUDSEY JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1201497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pudsey Juniors are a football club that runs from soccer tots all the way through to under 16s, based at Queens Park in Pudsey.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £112,839
Total expenditure: £74,807

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Welch Trustee 04 June 2024
None on record
Kevin Bryant Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
MARTYN IREMONGER Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
Ben Duckworth Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
Ian Dent Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
Jonathan Wendel Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
David McLean Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record
Lorraine Wilson Trustee 05 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2024
Total gross income £112.84k
Total expenditure £74.81k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 21 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Round Hill Road
PUDSEY
West Yorkshire
LS28 8BJ
Phone:
07957110392