HIGHER PRESTWICH HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 1202519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities including prayer services, Talmud and Bible Classes; social activities for members and others; fund-raising.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £494,030
Total expenditure: £133,363

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bury

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Joseph Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
SUSAN REED Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record
Ivan Lewis Trustee 05 March 2023
J-HUB
Received: On time
BC COMMUNITY LIMITED
Recently registered
Ian Neville Geller Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £494.03k
Total expenditure £133.36k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
445 Bury Old Road
Prestwich
Manchester
M25 1QP
Phone:
01617734800
Website:

No information available