ROBERT PASHLEY MEMORIAL HALL, WALFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall and Community Building for the residents of Walford, Herefordshire and other local groups or individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 06 August 1965: Standard registration
- WALFORD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- ROBERT PASHLEY MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Francis Pople | Chair | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Verney | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Pople | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Phillipson | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jones | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lois Wilson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Holton | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Morgan | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.38k | £20.52k | £10.69k | £11.63k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.13k | £8.76k | £13.73k | £12.57k | £13.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.22k | £2.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 2ND FEBRUARY, 1965
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITNATS.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF WALFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Robert Pashley Memorial Hall
Walford
ROSS-ON-WYE
Herefordshire
HR9 5QS
- Phone:
- 07951719691
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window