THE HOPE INITIATIVE UK CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hope Initiative UK provides essential support services (food bank, food boxes , a limited number of energy vouchers, advisory services, signposting directories, coaching sessions) to improve the health and wellbeing of individuals and families who are in need, have experienced ill health or been affected by domestic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Ayo Sonoiki | Chair | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ayo Olaniyan | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yetunde Banjoko | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2023 as amended on 31 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
For the public benefit to relieve the needs of and protect, as well as preserve good health among people who are experiencing or have experienced domestic abuse, ill health and distress by: a) the delivery of food boxes, toiletries and clothing parcels, b) Operation of a Food Bank c) Operation of an Energy Bank which will issue energy vouchers towards their energy bills d) the delivery essential care packages and boxes for local refuges e) signposting and advisory services f) general and professional counselling sessions g) mentoring h) an online selfcare resources hub i) an online advice hub j) awareness campaigns and training k) general support online, via the telephone, in person and in group programmes l) activities which enhance positive health and wellbeing.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFICE 4
219 KENSINGTON HIGH STREET
LONDON
W8 6BD
- Phone:
- 07957316807
- Email:
- admin@thiuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window