SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 1201870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide a rescue service to people and animals lost or injured in remote moorland areas of Swaledale and Wensleydale, North Yorkshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £108,045
Total expenditure: £67,169

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 February 2023: CIO registration
  • 21 May 2025: Funds received from 501885 SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Wharton Trustee 22 May 2024
KELD RESOURCE CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Charles Darren Ashcroft West Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
John Gilleard Trustee 01 December 2023
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Dr Hilary Ann Cross Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Timothy David Cain MBE Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Stephen Peter Clough Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £108.05k
Total expenditure £67.17k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
HIPSWELL ROAD WEST
CATTERICK GARRISON
North Yorkshire
DL9 3EH
Phone:
01748886807