HARROGATE CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue, rehabilitate and rehome cats and kittens
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CELIA MARGARET ELISSA DAKIN | Chair | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Katey Marie Saville | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Louise Newsholme | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Lee-Anne Audsley | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Christine Balmforth | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Brumfitt | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN YORKSHIRE AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, TREATMENT AND REHOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS, AND TO RAISE AWARENESS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF ISSUES RELATING TO CAT WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 NYDD VALE TERRACE
HARROGATE
HG1 5HA
- Phone:
- 07749461042
- Email:
- harrogatecatrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
-
harrogatecatrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window