CORNWALL BUS PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public the acquisition, conservation, preservation and operation of heritage buses and coaches and associated artefacts and to advance the education of the public in the said vehicles for the benefit of the culture and heritage of Cornwall in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melvyl James Williams | Chair | 28 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul William Crate | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Cocks | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arron James Ian Kelly | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Leslie Martin | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Philip Shephard | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ACQUISITION, CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND OPERATION OF HERITAGE BUSES AND COACHES AND ASSOCIATED ARTEFACTS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SAID VEHICLES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF CORNWALL IN PARTICULAR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 JAN LUKE WAY
CAMBORNE
TR14 8FQ
- Phone:
- 07929009943
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window