RIVERSIDE CHURCH BURTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith, in Burton-on-Trent, the surrounding districts, the UK & the world in such ways as the Charity Trustees may from time to time decide; The relief of persons in condition of need or distress by reason of financial hardship, age, ill-health, disability or such other economic or social disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 June 2023: CIO registration
- BURTON RENEWAL FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leum Harris | Chair | 08 December 2013 |
|
|||||||
Timothy Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ruth Myers | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
PHILIP PUSEY | Trustee | 13 January 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN BURTON-UPON-TRENT, THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 1.2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR SUCH OTHER ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE. 1.3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BURTON-UPON-TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SAID INHABITANTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERSIDE CHURCH
HIGH STREET
BURTON-ON-TRENT
STAFFS
DE14 1LD
- Phone:
- 01283535999
- Email:
- office@riversideburton.com
- Website:
-
WWW.RIVERSIDECHURCHBURTON.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window