The Western Orthodox Church, known as the Vicariate of Saint Paulinus

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH OF THE WESTERN EUROPEAN LITURGICAL, MUSICAL AND SPIRITUAL EXPRESSION, INCLUDING THE HISTORY AND RELIGIOUS CULTURE, IN SUCH WAYS TO SUCH PEOPLE, WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR AGE, OR CONDITION, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, IN THE LANGUAGE OF THE LOCALITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 January 2023: CIO registration
- THE VICARIATE OF SAINT PAULINUS (Working name)
- "THE WESTERN RITE ORTHODOX CHURCH", KNOWN AS THE VICARIATE OF SAINT PAULINUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Reverend Father Martin Charlesworth | Chair | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERESA MELITA MACK | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Stanforth | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/11/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 November 2023 | 23 October 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 256 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jan 2023 as amended on 12 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH OF THE WESTERN EUROPEAN LITURGICAL, MUSICAL AND SPIRITUAL EXPRESSION (KNOWN AS THE "WESTERN RITE"), INCLUDING THE HISTORY AND RELIGIOUS CULTURE, IN SUCH WAYS TO SUCH PEOPLE, WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR AGE, OR CONDITION, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, IN THE LANGUAGE OF THE LOCALITY, USING THE WESTERN RITE LITURGIES AS AUTHORISED BEING FOREMOST THE PAN-EUROPEAN LITURGY OF SAINT GERMAIN (GERMANUS OF PARIS), AND THOSE RITES AND USAGES CONTAINED AND ADVOCATED BY THE ORTHODOX CATHOLIC CHURCH FRANCE AND THE VICARIATE OF SAINT PAULINUS. (2) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT TO SUCH PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR AGE, OR CONDITION, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE. "ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN" MEANS THE FAITH SUBSCRIBED TO BY THOSE CHURCHES COMMONLY DESIGNATED "EASTERN ORTHODOX", "ORIENTAL ORTHODOX", AND "WESTERN ORTHODOX".
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 NEVILLE STREET
YORK
YO31 8NP
- Phone:
- 07306883321
- Email:
- admin@orthodoxsayork.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window