LONDON LGBTQ+ COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The London LGBTQ Community Centre is a safer, sober, intersectional, intergenerational, community centre and cafe for the entire community regardless of class, race, gender, age, ability or culture. Along with the cafe we run a programme of events including wellbeing, sexual and mental health sessions; book and film clubs, talks, creative workshops, skills sharing and a myriad of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £14,580 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Owain Thomas | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Reilly | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arkin Tansel Salih | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carys Boyle | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline George | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Jas | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Moore | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £382.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APR 2021
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG LGBTQ+ INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY WAY OF PROVIDING A COMMUNITY CENTRE PRIMARILY FOR LGBTQ+ INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR COMMUNITY; (B) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, AND IN PARTICULAR: I) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER IDENTITY, GENDER EXPRESSION AND SEXUAL ORIENTATION; II) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES THAT CONTRIBUTE TO THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF LGBTQ+ INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR COMMUNITY; III) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) LGBTQ+ INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR COMMUNITY; AND IV) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY INCLUDING BY RAISING AWARENESS AND SHARING KNOWLEDGE WITH THE GENERAL PUBLIC. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS ARTICLE 2, ?LGBTQ+ INDIVIDUALS? SHALL MEAN INDIVIDUALS WHO IDENTIFY AS LESBIAN, GAY, BI, TRANS, QUEER AND / OR QUESTIONING AND THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR GENDER IDENTITY, GENDER EXPRESSION AND SEXUAL ORIENTATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60-62 HOPTON STREET
LONDON
SE1 9JH
- Phone:
- 07921103201
- Email:
- hello@londonlgbtqcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window