SOUTHGATE MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 December 2022: Standard registration
- SOUTHGATE MOSQUE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ajmal Masroor | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHEEAM HUSSAIN | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruhul Amin | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE UK PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, SEMINARS AND EVENTS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southgate House
High Street London
N14 6BS
- Phone:
- 07956987398
- Email:
- info@southgatemosque.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window