GRANDFRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GrandFriends: The Company of Elders trains and supports our volunteers who we value as Elders and as community assets. Our Mission is to address intergenerational loneliness by creating mutually beneficial connections between GrandFriends and people of all younger generations through our innovative programmes, thereby building more cohesive communities with elders at the heart.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 21 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Anne Beattie | Chair | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA ELIZABETH SABINE | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Patrick Dunning | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Gregorowski | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO ARE EXPERIENCING LONELINESS BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH OR SOME OTHER REASON, THROUGH SOCIAL INTERACTION BETWEEN OLDER VOLUNTEERS AND YOUNGER PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Churchtown Road
Gwithian
HAYLE
Cornwall
TR27 5BX
- Phone:
- 01225 967 680
- Email:
- lavinia@grandfriends.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window