AUGHTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is run for the benefit of individuals & clubs in and around Aughton area.The Village Hall is available for hire by any individual (over the age of 18) or organisation, within the statement of standard hire agreement and scale of charges. Those charges are intended to meet all expenditure and to cover the repairs,renewals and maintenance of the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 September 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Douglas Grant | Chair | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sriya Ranjanee Kulupana | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jones | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Kierans | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Paula Skalycz | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Brian Fewings | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
William John Pendleton | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Jude Gallagher | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAY TOMLINSON | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Barbara Mullins | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Boulton | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MAX ROBERTS MBE | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
EUNICE WOOF MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.21k | £40.06k | £52.77k | £46.78k | £46.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.13k | £32.60k | £53.28k | £52.98k | £81.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £21.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JANUARY 1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S.74D DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF AUGHTON NR ORMISKIRK, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Swanpool Lane
Aughton
ORMSKIRK
Lancashire
L39 5AY
- Phone:
- 01695423289
- Email:
- igrant41@aol.com
- Website:
-
aughtonvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window