NADA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are solely for the promotion of equality and human rights by Raising society's awareness of the importance of human rights especially the rights of women and children Ending child marriage Helping victims of human rights abuse to start a new life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 April 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdel Al-ahdal | Chair | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lobna Maktari | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jashpal Singh | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nada Al-ahdal | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS, IN PARTICULAR, ARTICLE 16 OF THE UN DECLARATION AND ANY ARTICLE SET OUT UNDER CEDAW (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: ? MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ? OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; ? RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; ? RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; ? PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; ? CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; ? COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; ? RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; ? PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; ? PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; ? INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ? ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER - TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
402 Aidan House
Sunderland Road
Tynegate Precinct
GATESHEAD
Tyne And Wear
NE8 3HU
- Phone:
- 07342465468
- Email:
- Info@nadafund.org.uk
- Website:
-
nadafund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window