Accounts and annual returns BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT OUTDOOR PURSUITS CENTRE

Charity number: 521024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 15 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required