CLOCK FACE COLLIERY RECREATION GROUND AND CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES FREE SPORT AND RECREATION FOR ALL WHO WISH TO PARTAKE. THE SPORTS INCLUDE RUGBY, FOOTBALL, CROWN GREEN BOWLING AND ANGLING. THE CHARITY HAS A BRASS BAND, THERE IS AN OVER FIFTIES CLUB WHICH HAS FREE USE OF THE PREMISES EVERY MONDAY AND THE CLUB PROVIDES BINGO ON FOUR DAYS OF THE WEEK.THE AGES OF PEOPLE INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES RANGE FROM 4YRS TO LATE EIGHTIES. COMMUNITY HUB
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- St Helens
Governance
- 05 October 1965: Standard registration
- CLOCK FACE MINERS WELFARE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Hunt | Chair | 28 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gerrard | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pritchard | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Roach | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Roylance | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Edmonds | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Edmonds | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £12.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £26.50k | £18.61k | £17.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2024 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2023 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2023 | 716 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2023 | 1081 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22ND JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
4. OBJECT OF THE CHARITY (1) THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND CLUB FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY. (3) IN SO FAR AS THE LAND AND BUILDINGS IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME, OR OTHER ASSETS OF THE CHARITY, ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE SAID OBJECT IN (1) ABOVE, THEN PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE CONSULTED AND OBTAINED THE AGREEMENT OF THE TRUSTEES OF CISWO IN ADVANCE, THE TRUSTEES MAY USE THE CHARITY'S LAND AND OTHER ASSETS, FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW FOR THE DIRECT BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CLOCK FACE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Bridge Road
Clock Face
ST. HELENS
WA9 4UW
- Phone:
- 01744812291
- Email:
- craighacs@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window