ST PAUL'S CHURCH, STALYBRIDGE

Charity number: 1204186
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our objective is specifically to seek to enable people from our parish and beyond to engage in worship and prayer; to learn about the Gospel of Jesus; and to care pastorally for those within our church and parish. We do this by holding regular worship services; community events; baptisms, weddings and funerals, and discipleship groups.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STALYBRIDGE, ST PAUL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kathryn Emma Handley Chair 06 June 2016
HAMER YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
STALYBRIDGE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
CHESTER DIOCESAN MORAL AID CHARITY
Received: On time
Kathryn Margaret Leigh Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Helen Joanne Whitelegg Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Stuart John Robert Hobday Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
JANET SYLVIA MCBRIDE Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Jacqueline Kelly Yates Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Stephen Ronald Hugh Parkin Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
VIVIENNE DAWSON Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Jacintha Muriel Manchester Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Graham Phillip Handley Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
St Paul's Church
Huddersfield Road
Stalybridge
Cheshire
SK15 2PT
Phone:
01613382966