RAJO MENTAL HEALTH EDUCATION AND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include: Workshops to learn about mental health and how to find providers. Building accommodation to house mentally ill people. To provide the right medications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Somalia
Governance
- 11 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abdirashid Takar | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdirahman Nur | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sahra Ashkir | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £764 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: TO SUPPORT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF EVERYONE AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES PARTICULARLY IN THE UK SOMALI COMMUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) WORKING TO IMPROVE THE UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF MENTAL ILLNESS AMONGST THE PUBLIC WHILST TACKLING CULTURAL BARRIERS. B) ENHANCING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUFFERERS INCLUDING PRACTICAL HELP AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. C) PROVIDING A BRIDGE BETWEEN MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND THE SOMALI COMMUNITY THROUGH CULTURALLY SENSITIVE SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 GREEN LANE CLOSE
LEICESTER
LE5 4NJ
- Phone:
- +447963120540
- Email:
- rajomhes@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window