HATZOLA CANVEY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
xx
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 24 May 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yidele Herzka | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
TRAINDA GOLDMAN | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Simche Hillel Elias | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Abraham Kaff | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY AMBULANCE SERVICES AND OTHER STATUTORY BODIES IN PARTICULAR THROUGH: A) A VOLUNTEER EMERGENCY MEDICAL FIRST RESPONSE SERVICE TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THOSE WHO ARE ILL OR SICK OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF MEDICAL CARE AND ATTENTION B) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE DIRECTED TOWARDS PROMOTING HEALTH, SAFETY AND FIRST AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodberry Manor
Woodberry Close
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 9PP
- Phone:
- 01268975014
- Email:
- admin@hatzolacanvey.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window