Accounts and annual returns LEVERHULME PARK

Charity number: 521039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2024 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2025 1095 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required