BOLTON UNIT 46 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For young people between the ages of 10 and 18 years, volunteering opportunities for adults. Educational activities, taught in the naval way. Seamanship, Marine Engineering, Marine Field Training, various boatwork activities, teamwork and other activities. BTEC can also be attained via the Sea Cadet training scheme. New skills in a fun, safe and supervised environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 13 January 1964: Standard registration
- BOLTON SEA CADETS (Working name)
- T.S DIDO (Working name)
- UNIT 46, SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Kakoullis | Chair | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Craig Ogden | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Ogden | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ogden | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Wood | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lee | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Megan Duxbury | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.99k | £3.56k | £29.49k | £31.51k | £76.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.67k | £6.32k | £24.07k | £38.17k | £25.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.77k | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
BOLTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bolton Sea Cadets
101 Castle Street
BOLTON
BL2 1JP
- Phone:
- 01204526749
- Email:
- boltonscctreasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window