MORGAN'S ARMY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support families of children diagnosed with cancer in South Wales through equipment grants, hardship grants, bereavement boxes and peer support events. We also contribute to projects run by major welsh childhood cancer charities that benefit our families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Melfa Elizabeth Ridler | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Condon | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carys Wright | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carinae Davies | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nova John | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicole Dummett | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Williams | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Marzarno | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Phillips-Bennett | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Anita John | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JONES | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JOHN RIDLER | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CARA LOUGHER | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (UP TO THE AGE OF 21) WITH A CANCER DIAGNOSIS IN SOUTH WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A. PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO FAMILIES TO ALLOW THEM TO CARE AND ASSIST THOSE AFFECTED WITH A CANCER DIAGNOSIS. B. PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CANCER CHARITIES TO CONTINUE TO PROVIDE ESSENTIAL CANCER CARE THAT IN PARTICULAR BENEFIT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 FRAMPTON ROAD
GORSEINON
ABERTAWE
89 Frampton Road
Gorseinon
SA4 4XZ
- Phone:
- 07460894388
- Email:
- info@morgansarmy.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window