BRUNSWICK YOUTH CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sefton
Governance
- 18 April 1967: Standard registration
- 14 September 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 September 2009: Funds transferred to 1130227 BRUNSWICK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
- BRUNSWICK YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- BRUNSWICK BOY'S CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.78k | £179.98k | £205.14k | £200.23k | £212.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.13k | £178.72k | £204.07k | £211.41k | £206.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 17 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 11 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 11 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 18 MAY 1993.
Charitable objects
(I) TO HELP AND EDUCATE PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SPIRITUAL, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (II) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR USE FOR THE PURPOSES OF A YOUTH CENTRE CONDUCTED IN CONFORMITY WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND OBJECTS OF THE MERSEYSIDE YOUTH ASSOCIATION LIMITED.
Area of benefit
BOOTLE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window