The Military Heritage Museum

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Military Heritage Museum is a military museum aiming to explore, research and exhibit aspects of the military history of Gosport and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £1,065 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 March 2023: CIO registration
- CONFLICT MILITARY MUSEUM GOSPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Mathison | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John West | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Mar 2023 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM TELLING THE STORY OF MILITARY HISTORY IN GOSPORT AND BY EXHIBITING THE MUSEUM’S COLLECTION IN SUCH OTHER PUBLIC SPACES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Kings Road
LEE-ON-THE-SOLENT
Hampshire
PO13 9NU
- Phone:
- 07970495113
- Email:
- Nickwest.historian@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window