KEY TO JOY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Key to Joy provides fun and educational activities for adults with mild to moderate learning disabilities in the local community. The charity provides a safe space for its attendees to interact socially as well as life skills training to empower them in their day to day lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- FNC (Working name)
- THE FRIDAY NIGHT CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYN DAVIS | Chair | 23 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Garner | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mouat | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas How | Trustee | 23 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Clare Farrell | Trustee | 23 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 23 DEC 2022 AMENDED ON 11 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES LIVING IN FAREHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN FAREHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard House
Kiln Hill
Soberton
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 3QE
- Phone:
- 07511114516
- Email:
- governance@keytojoy.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window