CHIPPING AND DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political religious or other opinions, including the use for; meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Eveson | Chair | 14 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hunt | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hardman | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Walmsley | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Atkinson | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Davies | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Fenton | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ross | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Craig | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Clare Compton | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Kelsall | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hore | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN BUTTERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.91k | £50.23k | £42.07k | £32.20k | £38.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.47k | £53.76k | £54.62k | £57.61k | £53.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.50k | £14.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GOVERN BY SCHEME OF THE 2ND OF OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
CHIPPING AND LEAGRAM WITH LITTLE BOWLAND AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chipping Village Hall
Garstang Road
Chipping
Preston
Lancs
PR3 2QH
- Phone:
- 0199561835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window