Trustees CHIPPING AND DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 521070

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Eveson | Chair | 14 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hunt | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hardman | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Walmsley | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Atkinson | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Davies | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Fenton | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ross | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Craig | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Clare Compton | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Kelsall | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hore | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN BUTTERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.