FOUR COUNTIES GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A partnership of Bible-centred churches in Bedfordshire, Buckinghamshire, Hertfordshire, and Northamptonshire, working together to train and support leaders, strengthen and plant churches, and advance the gospel throughout the four counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Brendan Diaper | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Isaac Timothy Pain | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Gareth William Mitchell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Donald Sewall | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BEDFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, HERTFORDSHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (?THE FOUR COUNTIES?) AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY ESTABLISHING A PARTNERSHIP OF BIBLE-CENTRED CHURCHES IN THE FOUR COUNTIES WORKING TOGETHER TO TRAIN CHRISTIAN LEADERS TO STRENGTHEN AND PLANT CHURCHES AND TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Kings Road
Flitwick
Bedfordshire
MK45 1ED
- Phone:
- 07544862929
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window