JAKE'S MAGICAL MEMORY MAKERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We create lasting memories for family who suffer from Mitochondrial disease, though means of holidays, experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 2023: Standard registration
- JAKE MAGICAL MEMORY MAKERS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Brooks | Chair | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
becky Jade lamb | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ellen Rixon | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
stephanie Rachel Brooks | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JAN 2023 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND, WALES AND FURTHER AFIELD, BY PROVIDING PERSONS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH HOLIDAYS, EXCURSIONS AND EXPERIENCES TO MAKE MAGICAL MEMORIES FOR WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52A OAKEY FIELD ROAD
THURSTON
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 3RX
- Phone:
- 07824470530
- Email:
- Pdb1983@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window