CROFT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Croft Village Hall serves the local community and surrounding areas by providing facilities for many user groups. These comprise, pre school. indoor bowls, keep fit. ballet classes, bridge, mother and baby groups, childrens' acting classes, Police community meetings, Parish council meetings. The halls are used for private functions such as parties, dances, wedding receptions, funeral wakes etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 20 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Gratton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Coon | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Carole Thewsey | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY ORRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.47k | £13.28k | £32.55k | £24.77k | £25.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.15k | £16.71k | £16.30k | £24.61k | £24.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.82k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21 JUNE 1965
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CROFT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croft Memorial Village Hall
Mustard Lane
Croft
WARRINGTON
WA3 7BQ
- Phone:
- 07895999051
- Email:
- cvmhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
cvmhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window