Mindful For All

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We utilise the time-honoured benefits of physical activity to promote positive wellbeing.
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2023: CIO registration
- MINDFULL FOR ALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Curzons | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Elms | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rich Brownson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Alexander | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2023 as amended on 15 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Lincroft Crescent
COVENTRY
CV5 8GU
- Phone:
- 07946 071557
- Email:
- info@mindfulfa.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window